VA HB1331 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1331
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; in-network guarantees. Prohibits a health carrier that offers a managed care plan from entering into, extending, or renewing a provider contract with a facility unless such provider contract contains provisions requiring that each health care provider (i) that provides emergency or ancillary services at the facility is an in-network provider or has agreed to have his reimbursement from the health carrier included as part of the health carrier's payment to the facility and to not separately bill the health carrier or the covered person for emergency or ancillary services provided at such facility and (ii) that any laboratory or diagnostic services provided at the facility are in-network or, if such services are referred by a provider at the facility, the referral is to an in-network provider.
Title
Health insurance; in-network guarantees.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104167D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1331 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1331 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1331+hil |