VA HB1316 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; average final compensation. Provides that if an employee receives increases in compensation related to a promotion or new position in the last four years of service that exceed 400 percent of the employee's average annual compensation during the preceding three years, then the employee's service retirement allowance shall be based upon average annual compensation during the employee's final 10 years of service. The provision would not apply to an employee who returns to service after at least a one year gap in service, who receives a judicial appointment, or who is elected Governor or Attorney General.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; average final compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2014-11-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-11-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101080D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1316 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1316+hil |