VA HB1313 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School Performance Report Card; rankings. Eliminates the A-F school grading system created in the 2013 Session and amended in the 2014 Session and permits the Board of Education to rank schools and school divisions based on the information contained in each School Performance Report Card. The bill requires any such designations of rank to be in a form different from the letter grades used by such schools and school divisions to grade student performance.
Title
School Performance Report Card; rankings.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Education |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-11-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-11-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100197D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1313 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1313+hil |