VA HB1298 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Noncommercial vessels; reasonable suspicion. Requires law-enforcement officers to have reasonable suspicion that a violation of law or regulation exists before stopping, boarding, or inspecting a noncommercial vessel on the navigable waters of the Commonwealth. The bill allows conservation police officers and Virginia Marine Police officers to (i) stop, board, and inspect in order to inspect hunting, fishing, or trapping licenses or creel and bag limits and (ii) conduct lawful boating safety checkpoints in accordance with established policies of the two agencies.
Title
Noncommercial vessels; reasonable suspicion.
Sponsors
Del. Rick Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 26-N) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 26-N) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 484 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1298ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 10-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 10-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105652D-H2 |
2015-02-27 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Stanley, Lewis |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Morris, Hodges, Murphy |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105279D-S1 (1-Y 95-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1298S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105279D-S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105279D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 26-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (68-Y 26-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 15104303D-EH1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1298EH1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Amendment by Delegate Morris agreed to |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104303D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104303D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-19 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2014-11-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-11-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100733D |