VA HB1268 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for participation in community corrections alternative program; evaluation and diagnosis; referral to the Department of Corrections. Provides that a probation and parole officer may refer a defendant on probation to the Department of Corrections for evaluation and diagnosis to determine eligibility and suitability for participation in the community corrections alternative program prior to the approval of the court. Under current law, such referral may take place with the approval of the court. The bill also makes technical amendments.
Title
Community corrections alternative program; evaluation and diagnosis to determine eligibility.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Paul Milde [R] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1268ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102138D |