VA HB1261 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Energy Plan; carbon dioxide emission control impact; schedule. Requires the Virginia Energy Plan to include, with regard to any regulations proposed or promulgated by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency to reduce carbon dioxide emissions from fossil fuel-fired electric generating units under Section 37 111(d) of the Clean Air Act, an analysis of the costs to and benefits for energy producers and electric utility customers; the effect on energy markets and reliability; and the commercial availability of technology required to comply with such regulations. The measure postpones the due date for quadrennial updates to the Virginia Energy Plan from July 1 to October 1. Interim updates on the Plan are required to be provided by October 1 of the third year of each administration. The measure also requires the Division of Energy of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy, in Plan updates starting in 2014, to set forth energy policy positions relevant to any potential regulations of the State Air Pollution Control Board to reduce carbon dioxide emissions from fossil fuel-fired electric generating units under Section 111(d) of the Clean Air Act. The Division is required to address policy options for establishing separate standards of performance for carbon dioxide emissions from existing fossil fuel-fired electric generating units to promote the Plan's overall goal of fuel diversity. The Plan is also required to (i) examine policy options for state regulatory action to adopt less stringent standards or longer compliance schedules than those provided for in applicable federal rules or guidelines and (ii) identify options, to the maximum extent permissible, for any federally required regulation of carbon dioxide emissions from existing fossil fuel-fired electric generating units.
Title
Carbon dioxide; regulating emissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 603 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1261ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 2-N) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1261H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104434D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104434D-H1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14104183D |
Same As/Similar To
SB615 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)