VA HB1072 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Scanning information from driver's license. Prohibits any merchant in the Commonwealth from scanning the machine-readable zone of an individual's Department of Motor Vehicles-issued identification card or driver's license, except to (i) verify authenticity of the identification card or driver's license or to verify the identity of the individual if the individual pays for goods or services with a method other than cash, returns an item, or requests a refund or an exchange; (ii) verify the individual's age in certain circumstances; (iii) prevent fraud or other criminal activity if the individual returns an item or requests a refund or an exchange and the merchant uses a fraud prevention service company or system; (iv) record, retain, or transmit information as required by state or federal law; (v) provide information to a regulated check services company; or (vi) complete a transaction permitted under certain federal statutes. Similar restrictions are imposed on a merchant's ability to retain or sell information obtained from such a scan. A person aggrieved by a violation may bring an action to recover damages of $100 per violation, reasonable attorney fees, and court costs.
Title
Personal Information Privacy Act; use of DMV-issued driver's license or ID card information.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Del. Scott Garrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 789 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1072ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-06 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1072ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 14103553D-E |
2014-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1072E |
2014-01-31 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103553D |
Same As/Similar To
SB40 (Same As) 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)