VA HB1067 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0214)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0214)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacy technicians; expansion of allowable duties. Allows pharmacy technicians to clarify quantity or refills for a prescription issued for a Schedule VI drug. Current law only allows pharmacy technicians to accept refill authorizations. The bill also allows pharmacy technicians to accept electronic transfer of a refill for a Schedule VI drug upon order of the pharmacist-in-charge or pharmacist on duty if the refill is not an on-hold prescription. The bill defines "on-hold prescription" as a valid prescription that is received and maintained at the pharmacy for initial dispensing on a future date. Pharmacy technicians; expansion of allowable duties. Allows pharmacy technicians to clarify quantity or refills for a prescription issued for a Schedule VI drug. Current law only allows pharmacy technicians to accept refill authorizations. The bill also allows pharmacy technicians to accept electronic transfer of a refill for a Schedule VI drug upon order of the pharmacist-in-charge or pharmacist on duty if the refill is not an on-hold prescription. The bill defines "on-hold prescription" as a valid prescription that is received and maintained at the pharmacy for initial dispensing on a future date.
Title
Pharmacy technicians; expansion of allowable duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0214) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 214 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1067ER) |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Health Professions |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned sub: Health Professions |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102344D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |