VA HB1027 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Check cashers; customer identification; civil penalty. Requires a person conducting business as a check casher to make a copy of each item cashed and either make a copy of the customer's valid identification document or obtain the customer's thumbprint. Records for each transaction are required to be retained for one year and made available to law-enforcement officials. A violation of any of these requirements is punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $200.
Title
Check cashers; customer identification, civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102042D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1027 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1027+hil |