VA HB10 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Judges; retirement allowance and service after retirement. Provides that the annual retirement allowance of any person who has served as a judge but retires under a different defined benefit retirement plan shall not exceed 78 percent of the person's average final compensation, unless such person after ceasing to be a judge performs five or more years of creditable service under such other defined benefit retirement plan. However, in no case shall such person's annual retirement allowance exceed 100 percent of his average final compensation. The bill also clarifies that only those persons who retired as a judge or justice may serve as a senior jurist on the Supreme Court or the Court of Appeals. The bill also contains technical amendments. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Judges; retirement allowance and service after retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 776 (effective 4/23/14) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB10ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB10ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Senate substitute with amendments agreed to by House 14105056D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB10S1 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Norment agreed to |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105056D-S1 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105056D-S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 14100721D-E |
2014-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB10E |
2014-01-30 | House | Emergency clause added |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-11-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100721D |
Subjects
Courts Not of Record
Courts of Record
Emergency Legislation
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Pensions, Benefits, and Retirement
Courts of Record
Emergency Legislation
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Pensions, Benefits, and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |