UT SB0285 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education Contribution on Tax Returns
Title
Education Contribution on Tax Returns
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2012-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2012-03-07 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-07 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-05 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-05 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-27 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-27 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-27 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-27 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |