UT SB0160 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Funding Amendments
Title
Transportation Funding Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-09 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-09 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-09 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-09 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-06 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-02-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Transportation
Highways
Motor Fuel and Special Fuel Taxes
Revenue and Taxation
Transportation
Transportation Fund
Highways
Motor Fuel and Special Fuel Taxes
Revenue and Taxation
Transportation
Transportation Fund