UT SB0098 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Treatment Medication Amendments
Title
Treatment Medication Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/SB0098.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillint/SB0098.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SB0098.fn.pdf |