UT HB0219 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Unregulated Child Custody Transfer Act
Title
Uniform Unregulated Child Custody Transfer Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-14 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-14 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-01 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-25 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-04 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Adoption
Child Custody/Parent Time
Child Welfare
Department of Human Services
Division of Child and Family Services
Family
Guardians
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Parentage
Uniform Laws
Child Custody/Parent Time
Child Welfare
Department of Human Services
Division of Child and Family Services
Family
Guardians
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Parentage
Uniform Laws