UT HB0187 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limitation on Special Mitigation Based on Victim Identity
Title
Limitation on Special Mitigation Based on Victim Identity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Bill Substituted by Sponsor in House Rules Comm from # 0 to # 1 in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |