UT HB0049 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Justice Court Reform Task Force Sunset Extension
Title
Justice Court Reform Task Force Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-23 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-01-23 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-01-23 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-17 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-17 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-17 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Court Rules
Courts
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Sunsets and Repealers
Courts
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Sunsets and Repealers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 29 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |