US SR498 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4626)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4626)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirms the support of the Senate for Israel's right to defend its citizens and ensure Israel's survival. Condemns the unprovoked rocket fire at Israel and calls on Hamas to cease all rocket and other attacks against Israel. Calls on Palestinian Authority (PA) President Mahmoud Abbas to dissolve the unity governing arrangement with Hamas and condemn the attacks on Israel.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate regarding United States support for the State of Israel as it defends itself against unprovoked rocket attacks from the Hamas terrorist organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4626) |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 469. |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4417) |
Same As/Similar To
HR657 (Related) 2014-07-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Arab-Israeli relations
Conflicts and wars
Gaza Strip
Israel
Middle East
Palestinians
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Conflicts and wars
Gaza Strip
Israel
Middle East
Palestinians
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status