US SB877 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-203.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-203.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Affairs Research Transparency Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make available on a publicly-available Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) website: (1) data files that contain information on VA research, (2) a data dictionary on each data file, and (3) instructions on how to obtain access to each data file for use in research. Directs the Secretary, within 540 days after enactment of this Act, to require, as a condition on the use of any data gathered or formulated from research funded by the VA, that any final, peer-reviewed manuscript prepared for publication that uses such data be submitted to the Secretary for deposit in a digital archive (established by the Secretary under this Act). Requires such archive to be publicly available. Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs-Department of Defense Joint Executive to submit to the Secretary and the Secretary of Defense (DOD) options and recommendations for establishing a program of long-term cooperation and data-sharing between and within the VA and DOD to facilitate research on outcomes of military service, readjustment after combat deployment, and other topics of importance to veterans, members of the Armed Forces (members), their families, and members of communities that have a significant population of veterans or members.
Title
Veterans Affairs Research Transparency Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-203. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB944 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 258.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/877/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s877/BILLS-113s877is.pdf |