US SB3753 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7588)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7588)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forest Management for Rural Stability Act
Title
Forest Management for Rural Stability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7588) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2340 (Related) 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB1027 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3645 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1027 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3645 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3753/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3753/BILLS-115s3753is.pdf |