US SB3697 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the Space National Guard.
Title
Space National Guard Establishment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Laphonza Butler [D-CA] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. J.D. Vance [R-OH] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
HB3048 (Related) 2023-05-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB503 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB3048 (Related) 2023-05-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB503 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/3697/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s3697/BILLS-118s3697is.pdf |