US SB3609 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to ensure that women seeking an abortion are informed of the medical risks associated with the abortion procedure and the major developmental characteristics of the unborn child, before giving their informed consent to receive an abortion.
Title
Woman’s Right To Know Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7044 (Same As) 2024-01-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1126 (Related) 2023-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6636 (Related) 2023-12-12 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6825)
HB1126 (Related) 2023-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6636 (Related) 2023-12-12 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6825)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/3609/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s3609/BILLS-118s3609is.pdf |