US SB3008 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-286.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-286.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Relief for Servicemembers Act of 2014 - Amends the Honoring America's Veterans and Caring for Camp Lejeune Families Act of 2012 to extend through calendar year 2015 the one-year period after a service member's military service during which: (1) a court may stay proceedings to enforce an obligation on real or personal property owned by the service member before such military service; and (2) any sale, foreclosure, or seizure of such property shall be invalid without a court order or waiver agreement signed by the service member. Revives, effective January 1, 2016 (currently, January 1, 2015), the old nine-month period in place of the one-year period granted by such Act.
Title
Foreclosure Relief and Extension for Servicemembers Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-286. |
2014-12-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-12-17 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-12 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10314) |
2014-12-12 | House | Mr. Flores asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2014-12-12 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10314-10315) |
2014-12-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6697; text: CR S6697) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5798 (Related) 2014-12-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Housing finance and home ownership
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Housing finance and home ownership
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs