US SB2922 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - By Senator Menendez from Committee on Foreign Relations filed written report. Report No. 113-313.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - By Senator Menendez from Committee on Foreign Relations filed written report. Report No. 113-313.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act - States that it is U.S. policy to: reaffirm the principles set forth in the United States-Hong Kong Policy Act of 1992; support the democratic aspirations of the people of Hong Kong; urge China's government to uphold its commitments to Hong Kong; support the establishment by 2017 of a democratic option to nominate and elect the Chief Executive of Hong Kong, and the establishment by 2020 of democratic elections for all members of the Hong Kong Legislative Council; and support freedom of the press. Amends the United States-Hong Kong Policy Act of 1992 to direct the Secretary of State to report by March 31, 2015, to Congress on conditions in Hong Kong that are of U.S. interest, and annually thereafter for 10 years or until the Secretary certifies that Hong Kong has held free and fair elections for 2 consecutive Chief Executive and 2 consecutive Legislative Council periods. Directs the Secretary to certify annually to Congress whether Hong Kong is sufficiently autonomous to justify separate treatment different from that accorded to China in any new laws, agreements, treaties, or arrangements entered into between the United States and Hong Kong. Exempts from the certification requirement new laws, agreements, treaties, or arrangements that support human rights, rule of law, or democracy in Hong Kong. Authorizes the Secretary to waive the certification requirement if in U.S. national interests, and with congressional notification.
Title
Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | Senate | By Senator Menendez from Committee on Foreign Relations filed written report. Report No. 113-313. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 651. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment. Without written report. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5696 (Same As) 2014-11-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Hong Kong
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
News media and reporting
Political movements and philosophies
Protest and dissent
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Kingdom
China
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Hong Kong
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
News media and reporting
Political movements and philosophies
Protest and dissent
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Kingdom