US SB2454 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Satellite Television Access Reauthorization Act of 2014 - Amends federal copyright law, as amended by the Satellite Television Extension and Localism Act of 2010 (STELA), to extend until December 31, 2019, the statutory license under which satellite carriers retransmit distant television broadcast stations to viewers who are unable to receive signals for such stations in their local market. (Currently, the statutory licensing authority for such satellite retransmissions is scheduled to expire on December 31, 2014.) Expands the local service area for cable retransmissions of low power television stations.
Title
Satellite Television Access Reauthorization Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 445. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3546) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3546) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4572 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5036 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 410.
SB2799 (Related) 2014-12-12 - By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 113-322.
HB5036 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 410.
SB2799 (Related) 2014-12-12 - By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 113-322.
Subjects
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Commerce
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Television and film
Commerce
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Television and film