US SB2299 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-01 - By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/18/2014. Report No. 113-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-01 - By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/18/2014. Report No. 113-266.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native American Languages Reauthorization Act of 2014 - Amends the Native American Programs Act of 1974 to reauthorize through FY2019 and revise a grant program administered by the Administration for Native Americans at the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to ensure the survival and continuing vitality of Native American languages. Decreases the required minimum number of enrollees in educational programs funded by the grant program from: 10 to 5 enrollees in Native American language nests, and 15 to 10 enrollees in the Native American language survival schools. Changes the duration of grants provided under the program.
Title
Native American Languages Reauthorization Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. John Walsh [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-01 | Senate | By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/18/2014. Report No. 113-266. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2797-2798) |
Same As/Similar To
HB726 (Related) 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Subjects
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Indian social and development programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Indian social and development programs