US SB2073 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 31, United States Code, to require agencies to include a list of outdated or duplicative reporting requirements in annual budget justifications, and for other purposes.
Title
Eliminate Useless Reports Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2024-05-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-05-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-05-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2073. |
2024-05-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-05-06 | House | Mr. LaTurner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-12-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-12-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6027; text: CR S6027) |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/27/2023 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-91. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5301 (Related) 2024-03-07 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 0.