US SB1719 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 281.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 281.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Poison Center Network Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize through FY2019: (1) a poison control nationwide-toll free phone number; and (2) a national media campaign to educate the public and health care providers about poison prevention and the availability of poison control center resources in local communities and to conduct advertising campaigns about the nationwide toll-free number. Revises and reauthorizes through FY2019 a grant program for accredited (currently, certified) poison control centers. Allows grant funds to be used to research, improve, and enhance the communications and response capability and capacity of the poison control centers to facilitate increased access to such centers through the integration and modernization of communications and data systems.
Title
Poison Center Network Act
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. John Rockefeller [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 281. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin without amendment. Without written report. |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3527 (Same As) 2014-01-24 - Became Public Law No: 113-77.
Subjects
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Telephone and wireless communication
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Telephone and wireless communication