US SB1678 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-135. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-135. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of State to annually report to Congress on steps the State Department has taken to help strengthen Taiwan's diplomatic relationships and partnerships around the world. (Taiwan is self-governing, but China considers it a renegade province and has taken actions to encourage countries and international organizations to limit or cut off relations with Taiwan.)
Title
Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 85 (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-135. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1678 by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1710) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 85). (text: 03/03/2020 CR H1452-1453) |
2020-03-04 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1494-1495) |
2020-03-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-03-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1678. |
2020-03-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1452-1454) |
2020-03-03 | House | Mr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-31 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6254-6255) |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4754 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Taiwan
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Taiwan