US SB167 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Became Public Law No: 115-169. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Became Public Law No: 115-169. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Memorial to Fallen Educators Act (Sec. 2) This bill designates as the "National Memorial to Fallen Educators" an existing memorial located at the National Teachers Hall of Fame in Emporia, Kansas. The memorial is not a unit of the National Park System, and its designation shall not require or allow federal funds to be expended for any purpose related to it.
Title
National Memorial to Fallen Educators Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 141 (Y: 384 N: 1 NV: 44 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-169. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-04-30 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-04-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-04-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 1 (Roll no. 141). (text: CR H3327) |
2018-04-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3328-3329) |
2018-04-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-04-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 167. |
2018-04-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3327) |
2018-04-16 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-12-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269; text: CR S8269) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 125. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 115-95. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2711 (Related) 2018-01-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 398.