US SB1535 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Justice Against Sponsors of Terrorism Act - Amends the federal judicial code to include among the exceptions to U.S. jurisdictional immunity of foreign states any statutory or common law tort claim arising out of an act of extrajudicial killing, aircraft sabotage, hostage taking, terrorism, or the provision of material support or resources for such an act, or any claim for contribution or indemnity relating to a claim arising out of such an act. Amends the federal criminal code to: (1) impose liability on any person who aids, abets, or conspires with a person who commits an act of international terrorism that is committed, planned, or authorized by a designated foreign terrorist organization and that injures a U.S. national; and (2) repeal provisions prohibiting civil actions against foreign states or foreign officials for damages related to acts of terrorism. Grants U.S. district courts personal jurisdiction, to the maximum extent permissible under the Fifth Amendment, over any person who commits or aids and abets an act of international terrorism, or who otherwise sponsors such act or the person who committed such an act, that injures a U.S. national. Makes this Act applicable to any civil action: (1) pending on, or commenced on or after, this Act's enactment date; and (2) arising out of an injury to a person, property, or business on or after September 11, 2001.
Title
Justice Against Sponsors of Terrorism Act
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-12-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6657-6658) |
2014-12-11 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | S.AMDT.4096 Amendment SA 4096 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | S.AMDT.4096 Amendment SA 4096 proposed by Senator Schumer. (consideration: CR S6658; text: CR S6658)In the nature of substitute. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6657-6660) |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 560. |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3143 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Federal district courts
Government liability
Jurisdiction and venue
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Federal district courts
Government liability
Jurisdiction and venue
Terrorism