US SB1302 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Became Public Law No: 112-119.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Became Public Law No: 112-119.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to offer to enter into a binding agreement with the city of Tracy, California, under which the Administrator may convey to the city any reversionary interest retained by the United States in a specified parcel of land conveyed to the city for educational or recreational purposes and all other terms, conditions, reservations, and restrictions imposed in connection with the conveyance of such parcel. Requires the city to pay to the Administrator not less than the appraised fair market value of the parcel, as determined by the Administrator pursuant to an appraisal, based on the highest and best use of the parcel. Treats such determination regarding the value of such parcel as being final. Makes the city responsible for reimbursing the Administrator for costs associated with the implementation of this Act, including the costs of each applicable appraisal and survey. Requires the net proceeds from such conveyance to be deposited into the Federal Buildings Fund and made available for expenditure for any lawful purpose consistent with the Administrator's authority. Prohibits anything in this Act from affecting or limiting the application of or obligation to comply with any environmental law.
Title
A bill to authorize the Administrator of General Services to convey a parcel of real property in Tracy, California, to the City of Tracy.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | House | Became Public Law No: 112-119. |
2012-05-15 | House | Signed by President. |
2012-05-10 | House | Presented to President. |
2012-05-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-05-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2299) |
2012-05-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1302. |
2012-05-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2299-2300) |
2012-05-07 | House | Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-04-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-04-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-08-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2011-08-05 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-08-05 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2011-08-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2011-08-05 | House | Received in the House. |
2011-08-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-08-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5283; text as passed Senate: CR S5283) |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 117. |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 112-40. |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2406 (Same As) 2011-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.