US HR447 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-16)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 2 (Roll no. 56). (text: CR H1693)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 2 (Roll no. 56). (text: CR H1693)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Values the close relationship the United States has established with Ukraine. Supports the democratic and European aspirations of the people of Ukraine. Calls on the United States and the European Union (EU) to work together to support a peaceful resolution to the political crisis in Ukraine. Condemns all acts of violence, and calls on the government of Ukraine to bring to justice those responsible for violence against peaceful protesters and to release and drop criminal charges against those detained for peacefully exercising their democratic rights. Welcomes the repeal by the Ukrainian parliament of most of the anti-democratic measures adopted on January 16, 2014, and urges President Yanukovych to engage in substantive talks with opposition leaders and to take additional steps to de-escalate tensions. Urges the United States and the EU to make clear to Ukraine's leaders that those who authorize or engage in violence against peaceful protesters will be held personally accountable. Supports Department of State measures to revoke the visas of several Ukrainians linked to the violence and encourages the Administration to consider additional targeted sanctions against those who authorize or engage in the use of force. Urges all parties to engage in constructive dialogue to find a peaceful solution to Ukraine's current political and economic crisis.
Title
Supporting the democratic and European aspirations of the people of Ukraine, and their right to choose their own future free of intimidation and fear.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree, as Amended (Y: 381 N: 2 NV: 48 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 2 (Roll no. 56). (text: CR H1693) |
2014-02-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1698-1699) |
2014-02-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-02-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 447. |
2014-02-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1693-1697) |
2014-02-10 | House | Mr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2014-01-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-01-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-01-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats. |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Economic performance and conditions
Europe
European Union
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
News media and reporting
Political movements and philosophies
Protest and dissent
Sanctions
Trade agreements and negotiations
Ukraine
Violent crime
Detention of persons
Economic performance and conditions
Europe
European Union
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
News media and reporting
Political movements and philosophies
Protest and dissent
Sanctions
Trade agreements and negotiations
Ukraine
Violent crime