US HR382 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of Red Ribbon Week. Encourages: (1) children and teens to choose to live drug-free lives, and (2) people in the United States to promote drug-free communities and to participate in drug prevention activities.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of Red Ribbon Week, October 23, 2013 through October 31, 2013.
Sponsors
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-10-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SR279 (Related) 2013-10-31 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7732)
Subjects
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Commemorative events and holidays
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/382/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres382/BILLS-113hres382ih.pdf |