US HR231 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1732) to preserve existing rights and responsibilities with respect to waters of the United States, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the concurrent resolution (S. Con. Res. 11) setting forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal year 2016 and setting forth the appropriate budgetary levels for fiscal years 2017 through 2025; and providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 43) disapproving the action of the District of Columbia Council in approving the Reproductive Health Non-Discrimination Amendment Act of 2014. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1732) to preserve existing rights and responsibilities with respect to waters of the United States, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the concurrent resolution (S. Con. Res. 11) setting forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal year 2016 and setting forth the appropriate budgetary levels for fiscal years 2017 through 2025; and providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 43) disapproving the action of the District of Columbia Council in approving the Reproductive Health Non-Discrimination Amendment Act of 2014.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1732) to preserve existing rights and responsibilities with respect to waters of the United States, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the concurrent resolution (S. Con. Res. 11) setting forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal year 2016 and setting forth the appropriate budgetary levels for fiscal years 2017 through 2025; and providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 43) disapproving the action of the District of Columbia Council in approving the Reproductive Health Non-Discrimination Amendment Act of 2014.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 242 N: 181 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 241 N: 181 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - On Consideration of the Resolution (Y: 240 N: 174 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 241 N: 181 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - On Consideration of the Resolution (Y: 240 N: 174 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-30 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 242 - 181 (Roll no. 181). (text: CR H2671-2672) |
2015-04-30 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 241 - 181 (Roll no. 180). (consideration: CR H2683-2684; text: CR H2683) |
2015-04-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 231. |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2671-2684) |
2015-04-30 | House | On question of consideration of the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 174 (Roll no. 179). (consideration: CR H2673-2674) |
2015-04-30 | House | Mrs. Watson Coleman raised a point of order against consideration of H. Res. 231 and the Chair recognized Mrs. Watson Coleman and Mr. Woodall for up to 10 minutes each on the point of order. After debate, the Chair will put the question of consideration on the resolution as the statutory means of disposing of the point of order in the following form: "Will the House now consider the resolution?". |
2015-04-30 | House | By direction of the Committee on Rules, Mr. Woodall called up H.Res. 231 for its immediate consideration. (consideration: CR H2671) |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 28. |
2015-04-29 | House | Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1732, the conference report to accompany S. Con. Res. 11, and H.J. Res. 43. |
2015-04-29 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-98, by Mr. Woodall. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR43 (Related) 2015-05-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1732 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SCR11 (Related) 2015-05-06 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB1732 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SCR11 (Related) 2015-05-06 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.