US HJR107 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment - States that the liberty of parents to direct the education of their children is a fundamental right. States that neither the United States nor any state shall infringe upon this right without demonstrating that its governmental interest as applied to the person is of the highest order and not otherwise served. Declares that no treaty may be adopted nor shall any source of international law be employed to supersede, modify, interpret, or apply to the rights guaranteed by this amendment.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to parental rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Francisco Canseco [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] |
Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Alan Nunnelee [R-MS] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Rep. Joe Walsh [R-IL] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution. |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR3 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
SJR42 (Related) 2012-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR110 (Related) 2012-07-18 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SJR42 (Related) 2012-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR110 (Related) 2012-07-18 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Elementary and secondary education
Families
Family relationships
International law and treaties
Elementary and secondary education
Families
Family relationships
International law and treaties
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-joint-resolution/107/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hjres107/BILLS-112hjres107ih.pdf |