US HCR89 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.
Title
Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.
Sponsors
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. Max Miller [R-OH] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Greg Landsman [D-OH] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2024-02-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-02-28 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H734) |
2024-02-28 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. |
2024-02-28 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H734) |
2024-02-28 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. |
2024-02-28 | House | Mr. Steil asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR25 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.