US HB910 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 84.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 84.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sikes Act Reauthorization Act of 2013 - Reauthorizes title I of the Sikes Act (conservation programs on military installations) for FY2015-FY2019.
Title
Sikes Act Reauthorization Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 84. |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2013-06-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-119, Part I. |
2013-05-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-05-15 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Executive agency funding and structure
Land use and conservation
Military facilities and property
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Executive agency funding and structure
Land use and conservation
Military facilities and property
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection