US HB7801 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Coastal Zone Management Act of 1972 to allow the Secretary of Commerce to establish a Coastal and Estuarine Resilience and Restoration Program, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend the Coastal Zone Management Act of 1972 to allow the Secretary of Commerce to establish a Coastal and Estuarine Resilience and Restoration Program, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2022-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3764 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 511.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7801/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7801/BILLS-117hr7801ih.pdf |