US HB7521 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To protect the national security of the United States from the threat posed by foreign adversary controlled applications, such as TikTok and any successor application or service and any other application or service developed or provided by ByteDance Ltd. or an entity under the control of ByteDance Ltd.
Title
Protecting Americans from Foreign Adversary Controlled Applications Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 86 (Y: 352 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2024-03-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 352 - 65, 1 Present (Roll no. 86). (text: CR H1163-1164) |
2024-03-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7521. |
2024-03-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1163-1171) |
2024-03-13 | House | Mrs. Rodgers (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-03-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 344. |
2024-03-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-417. |
2024-03-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0. |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |