US HB7251 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize certain poison control programs.
Title
Poison Control Centers Reauthorization Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 0. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 0. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7251/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7251/BILLS-118hr7251ih.pdf |