US HB7195 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for certain whistleblower incentives and protections.
Title
To provide for certain whistleblower incentives and protections.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 329. |
2022-07-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 117-423. |
2022-06-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-06-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2022-03-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3316 (Same As) 2022-12-08 - Held at the desk.