US HB7122 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit aid that will benefit Hamas, and for other purposes.
Title
Stop Support for UNRWA Act of 2024 Stop Support for United Nations Relief and Works Agency Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 334. |
2024-03-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 118-406. |
2024-02-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 19. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3174 (Related) 2023-10-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.