US HB7032 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Congressional Budget and Impoundment Control Act of 1974 to provide the Congressional Budget Office with necessary authorities to expedite the sharing of data from executive branch agencies, and for other purposes.
Title
Congressional Budget Office Data Sharing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Chuck Edwards [R-NC] | Rep. Rudolph Yakym III [R-IN] |
Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI] | Rep. Josh Brecheen [R-OK] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] |
Rep. Becca Balint [D-VT] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2024-04-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-04-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2679) |
2024-04-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7032. |
2024-04-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2679-2683) |
2024-04-29 | House | Mr. Yakym moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-04-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 393. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Budget. H. Rept. 118-474. |
2024-02-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 0. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Budget. |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |