US HB6324 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize major medical facility projects for the Department of Veterans Affairs for fiscal year 2024, and for other purposes.
Title
Fiscal Year 2024 Veterans Affairs Major Medical Facility Authorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2024-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-04-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-11-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-11-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-11-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6324/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6324/BILLS-118hr6324ih.pdf |