US HB6306 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 to prohibit the acquisition or lease of a consular or diplomatic post built or owned by an entity beneficially owned by the People's Republic of China, and for other purposes.
Title
Embassy Construction Integrity Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Mills [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] |
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2024-03-19 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-03-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6306. |
2024-03-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1194-1195) |
2024-03-19 | House | Mrs. Wagner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 0. |
2023-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |