US HB606 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-147.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-147.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 815 County Road 23 in Tyrone, New York, as the "Specialist Christopher Scott Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 815 County Road 23 in Tyrone, New York, as the "Specialist Christopher Scott Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] |
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Daniel Maffei [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-147. |
2014-08-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5329-5330) |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 507. |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-07-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6153) |
2014-07-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 606. |
2014-07-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6153-6154) |
2014-07-14 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-05-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SB233 (Same As) 2013-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
New York State
Postal service