US HB5714 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pest Management Records Modernization Act - Amends the Food, Agriculture, Conservation, and Trade Act of 1990 to authorize commercial applicators of pesticides to create, retain, submit, and convey a pesticide application-related record, report, data, or other information in electronic form to satisfy any federal, state, or local law.
Title
Pest Management Records Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
2014-12-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8231) |
2014-12-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5714. |
2014-12-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8231-8232) |
2014-12-02 | House | Mr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-11-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3001 (Related) 2013-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Business records
Computers and information technology
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Pest management
Business records
Computers and information technology
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Pest management