US HB5701 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Western Oregon Indian Tribal Lands Act - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to accept title to any additional acres of real property located within the boundaries of the original 1857 reservation of the Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon (comprising land within the political boundaries of Polk and Yamhill Counties, Oregon), if such real property is conveyed or otherwise transferred to the United States by or on behalf of the Tribe. Oregon Coastal Lands Act - Holds in trust for the Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua, and Siuslaw Indians all interest of the United States in and to approximately 14,408 acres of land. Cow Creek Umpqua Land Conveyance Act - Holds in trust for the Cow Creek Band of Umpqua Tribe of Indians all interest of the United States in and to approximately 17,519 acres of federal land. Amends the Siletz Tribe Indian Restoration Act to authorize the Secretary to take into trust for the Siletz Tribe additional lands that lie within the original 1855 Siletz Coast Reservation and are located in Benton, Douglas, Lane, Lincoln, Tillamook, or Yamhill County in Oregon. Amends the Coquille Restoration Act to give the United States District Court for the District of Oregon jurisdiction over actions between Oregon and the Coquille Tribe arising out of claims of breach of the memorandum of agreement for the management of the Coquille Forest.
Title
Western Oregon Indian Tribal Lands Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8882-8885) |
2014-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5701. |
2014-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8882-8886) |
2014-12-09 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2014-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2014-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB841 (Related) 2014-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
HB931 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 273.
HB5511 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB5512 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
SB402 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1014)
SB416 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
HB931 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 273.
HB5511 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB5512 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
SB402 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1014)
SB416 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Federal district courts
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Gambling
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Jurisdiction and venue
Land transfers
Native Americans
Oregon
Federal district courts
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Gambling
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Jurisdiction and venue
Land transfers
Native Americans
Oregon