US HB5683 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 488.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 488.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Access to Justice for Claims Against the United States Act - Amends the federal judicial code with respect to the jurisdiction of federal courts over civil actions pending in, or on appeal from, the U.S. Court of Federal Claims (USCFC) when the plaintiff also has pending in another federal court a civil action that includes a claim against the United States (or an agency or officer of the United States) arising from the same set of operative facts. Requires the court presiding over the action that was filed later to stay the later action until the action that was filed first is no longer pending. (Currently, the USCFC is prohibited from having jurisdiction of any claim in which the plaintiff has pending in any other court any suit or process against the United States or any person who was acting or professing to act under the authority of the United States.) Provides an exception to the requirement to stay the later action if: (1) the parties in each of the actions agree, or (2) the required stay is not in the interests of justice.
Title
Ensuring Access to Justice for Claims Against the United States Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 488. |
2014-12-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-650. |
2014-11-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-11-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-11-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2769 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.