US HB5665 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require a comprehensive assessment of certain Federal trails, campsites, boat docks, and outdoor recreation facilities to determine the accessibility options for individuals with disabilities, and for other purposes.
Title
Promoting Accessibility on Federal Lands Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-11-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-09-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-09-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5665/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5665/BILLS-118hr5665ih.pdf |